+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 26, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0810
- Effective Date January 1, 2005
- Governor Approved
On June 3, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 29, 2004
- Second Reading
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2004
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 730 ILCS 5/5-9-1.5 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-9-1.5
- 730 ILCS 5/5-9-1.7 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-9-1.7
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2004: HB4288 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 05, 2004
March 24, 2004: HB4288 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 24, 2004
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor