+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 26, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0809
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2005
On June 3, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 29, 2004
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 28, 2004
- Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Held in Judiciary
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On April 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 1, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Eliminates the new provision that an offender sentenced for a first violation of domestic battery must serve a mandatory sentence of at least 48 consecutive hours of imprisonment that is not subject to suspension or probation in order to reduce the sentence.
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/12-3.2 - from Ch. 38, par. 12-3.2
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2004: HB4287 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 05, 2004
March 31, 2004: HB4287 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 31, 2004
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor