+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 27, 2018 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0632
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 27, 2018
On June 8, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 010-000-000
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
May 10, 2018: HB4278 - Third Reading
April 26, 2018: HB4278 - Third Reading
April 11, 2018: HB4278 - Veterans' Affairs
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor