+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0653
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date February 26, 2021
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 113-000-000
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cunningham
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 11, 2021
- Second Reading
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Assigned to Executive
- Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 10, 2021
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Bill Cunningham
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-037-002
- Arrive in Senate
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 009-003-000
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Public Employee Disability Act. Provides that upon the occurrence of circumstances, directly or indirectly attributable to COVID-19, occurring on or after March 9, 2020 and on or before June 30, 2021 (instead of December 31, 2020) which would hinder the physical recovery from an injury of an eligible employee within a one-year period, the eligible employee shall be entitled to an extension of no longer than 60 days by which he or she shall continue to be paid by the employing public entity on the same basis as he or she was paid before the injury. Amends the Chicago Police and Chicago Firefighter Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. In provisions concerning line-of-duty death benefits and other death benefits, provides a rebuttable presumption that the death of a policeman or fireman from COVID-19 was a fatal injury while in active service if the policeman or fireman was exposed to and contracted COVID-19 on or after March 9, 2020 and on or before June 30, 2021 (instead of December 31, 2020). Amends the Workers' Occupational Diseases Act. Provides that the rebuttable presumption that the exposure to and contraction of COVID-19 by a COVID-19 first responder or front-line worker was causally connect to the hazards or exposures of the employee's first responder or front-line work employment if the diagnosis of COVID-19 was made on or after March 9, 2020 and on or before June 30, 2021 (instead of December 31, 2020). Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement by the State. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 20 ILCS 2705/2705-615 -
- 5 ILCS 345/1 - from Ch. 70, par. 91
- 40 ILCS 5/5-144 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 5-144
- 40 ILCS 5/5-153 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 5-153
- 40 ILCS 5/6-140 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 6-140
- 40 ILCS 5/6-150 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 6-150
- 820 ILCS 310/1 - from Ch. 48, par. 172.36
- 30 ILCS 805/8.44 new -