+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On December 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 225 ILCS 65/Art. 85 heading new
- 225 ILCS 65/85-5 new
- 225 ILCS 65/85-10 new
- 225 ILCS 65/85-15 new
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor