+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 13, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On May 8, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
On May 7, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
On May 6, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 016-000-000
On May 1, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
On April 16, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 023-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On January 9, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that there is no rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that there is no rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
May 8, 2008: HB4266 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 08, 2008
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor