+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On December 9, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor