+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (59)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0766
- Effective Date January 1, 2017
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 115-002-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 007-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-001-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Cunningham
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2016
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2016
- Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 27, 2016
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-012-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-001-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015
- Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the engrossed bill with the following changes: Provides that a person licensed under the Act who completes (rather than a person who is required to undergo the education) education, or his or her employer, shall not be civilly or criminally liable for acting in good faith or failing to act on information obtained during the course of employment concerning potential domestic violence or sexual assault. Provides that the one-hour domestic violence and sexual assault awareness continuing education course shall be provided only by a continuing education provider approved by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation, except that completion from March 12, 2016 to March 15, 2016 of a one-hour domestic violence and sexual assault awareness course from a domestic violence and sexual assault awareness organization shall satisfy the requirement. Provides that the Department may prescribe rules regarding the requirements for courses and teachers on domestic violence and sexual assault awareness. Makes other changes.
House Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with provisions of the bill as introduced with the following changes: Removes requirements that the program of study a person seeking licensure as a barber, cosmetologist, esthetician, hair braider, or nail technician must graduate from must include both domestic violence and sexual assault awareness education as determined by rule of the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Replaces references to "domestic violence and sexual assault education" with "domestic violence and sexual assault awareness education". Provides that for the initial renewal of a cosmetologist's, esthetician's, nail technician's, or hair braider's license one hour (rather than an unspecified amount) of the continuing education shall (rather than must) include domestic violence and sexual assault awareness education as prescribed by rule, and that for every subsequent renewal of a license, one hour of the continuing education may include domestic violence and sexual assault awareness education (rather than requiring a licensed person to undergo the domestic violence and sexual assault awareness education for every license renewal). Further amends the Barber, Cosmetology, Esthetics, Hair Braiding, and Nail Technology Act of 1985. Provides that a person licensed under the Act who is required to undergo domestic violence and sexual assault awareness education as a part of his or her continuing education shall not be civilly or criminally liable for acting in good faith or failing to act on information obtained during the course of employment concerning potential domestic violence or sexual assault.
+ − Statutes Amended (18)
- 225 ILCS 410/2-2 - from Ch. 111, par. 1702-2
- 225 ILCS 410/2-3 - from Ch. 111, par. 1702-3
- 225 ILCS 410/3-2 - from Ch. 111, par. 1703-2
- 225 ILCS 410/3-3 - from Ch. 111, par. 1703-3
- 225 ILCS 410/3-7 - from Ch. 111, par. 1703-7
- 225 ILCS 410/3A-2 - from Ch. 111, par. 1703A-2
- 225 ILCS 410/3A-6 - from Ch. 111, par. 1703A-6
- 225 ILCS 410/3C-2 - from Ch. 111, par. 1703C-2
- 225 ILCS 410/3C-8 - from Ch. 111, par. 1703C-8
- 225 ILCS 410/3E-2 -
- 225 ILCS 410/3E-5 -
- 225 ILCS 410/2-2 -
- 225 ILCS 410/2-3 -
- 225 ILCS 410/3-2 -
- 225 ILCS 410/3-3 -
- 225 ILCS 410/3A-2 -
- 225 ILCS 410/3C-2 -
- 225 ILCS 410/1-13 new -