+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Vote
February 26, 2020: HB4262 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (85)
Type:
Primary Sponsor