+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-043-000
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 005-002-000
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 7, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis
+ − Statute Amended
- 755 ILCS 40/10 - from Ch. 110 1/2, par. 851-10
+ − Votes (2)
February 23, 2022: HB4260 - Third Reading
January 19, 2022: HB4260 - Health Care Licenses
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor