+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
+ − Statutes Amended (19)
- 5 ILCS 410/10 -
- 5 ILCS 410/15 -
- 20 ILCS 105/3.10 -
- 20 ILCS 2310/2310-215 - was 20 ILCS 2310/55.62
- 30 ILCS 575/2 -
- 30 ILCS 577/35-5 -
- 30 ILCS 785/5 -
- 70 ILCS 210/23.1 - from Ch. 85, par. 1243.1
- 105 ILCS 5/34-18 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-18
- 110 ILCS 205/9.16 - from Ch. 144, par. 189.16
- 110 ILCS 925/3.07 - from Ch. 144, par. 1503.07
- 110 ILCS 930/2 - from Ch. 144, par. 2302
- 110 ILCS 947/50 -
- 110 ILCS 947/65.30 -
- 215 ILCS 5/500-50 -
- 305 ILCS 5/4-23 -
- 625 ILCS 5/11-212 -
- 720 ILCS 5/17-10.2 - was 720 ILCS 5/17-29
- 775 ILCS 5/2-105 - from Ch. 68, par. 2-105
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor