+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2006 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 23, 2006
- Arrive in Senate
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia Reid Lindner
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 009-000-000
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Public Utilities Committee
On January 4, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 15, 2005 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia Reid Lindner
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the bill as introduced with the following changes. Replaces the member appointed by the Governor who is a representative of public utilities with one member appointed by the Governor who is a representative of an electric public utility whose service area includes a county with a population of 1,000,000 or more and one member appointed by the Governor who is a representative of an electric public utility whose service area does not include a county with a population of 1,000,000 or more. Removes language concerning appropriations for moneys to reimburse members for reasonable expenses. Increases the number of voting members needed for a quorum to 5.