+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On August 1, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
On July 15, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto July 16, 2008
- Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Filed Accept Amendatory Veto Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
On July 14, 2008 in the House:
- Governor Amendatory Veto
On June 30, 2008 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2008 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-001-000
On May 30, 2008 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
On May 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 29, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
On May 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On May 29, 2008 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On May 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2008
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2008
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Link
- Second Reading
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 009-000-000
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance
On May 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
On May 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2008
- Do Pass Insurance; 010-000-000
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On March 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 28, 2008
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability and Access Committee; 012-000-000
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Availability and Access Committee
On January 7, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement.
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2008: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Saturday, May 31, 2008
May 29, 2008: HB4255 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 29, 2008
February 22, 2008: HB4255 - Third Reading - Friday, February 22, 2008
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor