+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- To Special Issues Subcommittee
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison