+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0974
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2005
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Recedes 057-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Filed with Secretary Sen. Dale A. Righter
- Placed on Calendar Order of Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 01 - May 28, 2004
- Secretary's Desk - Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 01
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Rules Referred to Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Be Approved for Consideration Judiciary; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Non-Concurs by Voice Vote
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. William B. Black
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Righter
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Judiciary; 007-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 29, 2004
- Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dale A. Righter
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 25, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William B. Black
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Requires public bodies to keep written minutes of closed, as well as open, meetings. Removes verbatim recordings of closed meetings from the requirement that the public body regularly review them to determine whether the need for non-disclosure continues. With respect to a civil action to enforce the Open Meetings Act, conditions the court's in camera review of verbatim recordings to determine whether a violation occurred upon the judge's belief as to the necessity of the examination.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Requires public bodies to keep written minutes of closed, as well as open, meetings. Removes verbatim recordings of closed meetings from the requirement that the public body regularly review them to determine whether the need for non-disclosure continues. With respect to a civil action to enforce the Open Meetings Act, conditions the court's in camera review of verbatim recordings to determine whether a violation occurred upon the judge's belief as to the necessity of the examination.
+ − Statute Amended
- 5 ILCS 120/2.06 - from Ch. 102, par. 42.06