+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-038-002
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 006-004-000
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Avery Bourne
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Avery Bourne
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Avery Bourne
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- Pension Note Filed
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 006-003-000
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 006-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On December 3, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 003
Removes references to community colleges and makes other changes to definitions related to public institutions of higher education.
House Amendment 002
Excludes the board of trustees of a community college district and a public community college from the provisions concerning emergency contraception. Provides that the vending machine must be located in an area of campus where students can access the emergency contraception on weekends or after class hours and that the price of emergency contraception may not exceed $40.
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2022: HB4247 - Third Reading
March 2, 2022: HFA0003 - Higher Education
February 24, 2022: HFA0002 - Higher Education
February 9, 2022: HB4247 - Higher Education
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor