+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 003-005-000
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 1, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer