+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (71)
On January 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Lost; 019-037-001
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Susan Garrett
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 11, 2005
- Approved for Consideration Rules
On December 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On November 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 10, 2004
- Approved for Consideration Rules
On August 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 7 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Larry K. Bomke
On May 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 7 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 7 Referred to Rules
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
On May 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; DeLeo
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Held in Labor & Commerce
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Be Adopted Labor & Commerce; 006-002-001
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Do Pass as Amended Labor & Commerce; 007-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2004
- Fiscal Note Requested by Sen. Kathleen L. Wojcik
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Sponsor Removed Sen. William R. Haine
On April 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Held in Labor & Commerce
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-003-000
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Monique D. Davis
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Labor Committee; 010-003-001
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Charles E. Jefferson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Cynthia Soto
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John A. Fritchey
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor Committee
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano
+ − Adopted Amendments (8)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Provides that the requirements of the Act shall not apply to any building that is owned or operated by a hospital or hospital affiliate as defined in the Hospital Licensing Act.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that a covered employer does not include a retail store or distribution center.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2
Provides that a covered employer does not include manufacturing and assembly or warehousing and logistic service facilities.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (2)
January 10, 2005: HB4241 - Third Reading - Monday, January 10, 2005
March 30, 2004: HB4241 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 30, 2004
+ − Sponsors (72)
Type:
Primary Sponsor