+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- To Sales, Amusement, & Other Taxes Subcommittee
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On November 29, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor