+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (55)
- Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto
- Governor Vetoed
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
- Do Pass Education; 011-000-000
- Assigned to Education
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Tabled
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 085-025-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Removed from Short Debate Status
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Withdrawn by Rep. Sue Scherer
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 007-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 005-003-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 006-002-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
- Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
- Re-assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sue Scherer
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 005
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill as amended by House Amendment No.1 with the following changes. Restores provisions requiring the completion of a teacher performance assessment and a test of content area knowledge for the issuance of certain educator licenses. Makes the provisions removing the requirement of passage of a test of basic skills applicable until June 30, 2025. Provides that, on or before July 1, 2025, the State Board of Education must reevaluate the method it uses to score a content area knowledge test and may adopt rules to make any changes to those methods. Removes the provision requiring a candidate in a teacher preparation program to receive a letter grade of at least a "C", or its equivalent, in his or her student teaching program to obtain the license. Makes conforming changes. Adds an immediate effective date (rather than a July 1, 2020 effective date).
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code. Repeals a Section requiring a system of examinations for the issuance of educator licenses. Provides that a candidate in a teacher preparation program must receive a letter grade of at least a "C", or its equivalent, in his or her student teaching program to obtain the license. Makes conforming changes. Effective July 1, 2020.
+ − Proposed Amendments (6)
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- 105 ILCS 129/1 -
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.11d -
- 105 ILCS 5/14-9.01 - from Ch. 122, par. 14-9.01
- 105 ILCS 5/21B-15 -
- 105 ILCS 5/21B-20 -
- 105 ILCS 5/21B-25 -
- 105 ILCS 5/21B-35 -
- 105 ILCS 5/21B-50 -
- 105 ILCS 5/21B-55 -
- 105 ILCS 5/21B-30 rep. -
- 105 ILCS 5/21B-30 -