+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On March 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 6, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 023-000-000
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On January 7, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 4, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Roger L. Eddy
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the State Board of Education may also not deduct the number of pupils enrolled in summer school from the number of pupils eligible for reimbursement if the pupils enrolled in summer school are transported at the same time as other eligible pupils.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the State Board of Education may also not deduct the number of pupils enrolled in summer school from the number of pupils eligible for reimbursement if the pupils enrolled in summer school are transported at the same time as other eligible pupils.
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/29-5 - from Ch. 122, par. 29-5
+ − Vote
March 4, 2008: HB4226 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 04, 2008
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor