+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 17, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 010-000-000
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On January 4, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 3, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Provides that neither the Governor nor any agency or agency head under the jurisdiction of the Governor has any rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 750 ILCS 5/607 - from Ch. 40, par. 607
- 750 ILCS 5/609 - from Ch. 40, par. 609