+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On August 29, 2008 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0943
- Effective Date January 1, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 30, 2008 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2008 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000
On May 30, 2008 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On May 28, 2008 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mike Fortner
On May 27, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bond
- Recalled to Second Reading
On May 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2008
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
On May 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Bond
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2008
- Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-000
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael Bond
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development
On March 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 28, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-001-000
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 4, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 3, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall provide staff support for the Illinois Science and Technology Commission.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall provide staff support for the Illinois Science and Technology Commission.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2008: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Saturday, May 31, 2008
May 23, 2008: HB4216 - Third Reading - Friday, May 23, 2008
February 22, 2008: HB4216 - Third Reading - Friday, February 22, 2008
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor