+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 10, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0057
- Effective Date August 10, 2007
- Governor Approved
On June 13, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 15, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2007
- Second Reading
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2007
- Do Pass Public Health; 010-000-000
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Health
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 2, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron Schock
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David R. Leitch
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act with provisions similar to those of House Bill 421, but with changes that include the following: (1) requires that reports of abuse or neglect made to the central register be transmitted to the appropriate Child Protective Service Unit "by the Department" of Children and Family Services; and (2) provides that all such reports alleging the death of a child, serious injury to a child, torture of a child, malnutrition of a child, and sexual abuse to a child shall also be immediately transmitted by the Department to the appropriate local law enforcement agency. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 325 ILCS 5/7 - from Ch. 23, par. 2057
- 325 ILCS 5/7.3 - from Ch. 23, par. 2057.3
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2007: HB0421 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 15, 2007
February 28, 2007: HB0421 - Third Reading - Wednesday, February 28, 2007
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor