+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On August 22, 2008 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0884
- Effective Date January 1, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 30, 2008 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2008 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000
On May 27, 2008 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On May 22, 2008 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Thomas Holbrook
On May 21, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2008
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary Criminal Law; 008-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary Criminal Law
On May 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary Criminal Law
On April 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 15, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On April 9, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 010-002-001
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On December 17, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 14, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Holbrook
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Reinserts the provisions of the bill, except that the court may consider a violation that results in the death of another person either as a business offense punishable by a fine of not less than $100 nor more than $10,000 or as a Class A misdemeanor.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Reinserts the provisions of the bill, except that the court may consider a violation that results in the death of another person either as a business offense punishable by a fine of not less than $100 nor more than $10,000 or as a Class A misdemeanor.
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/11-907 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-907
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2008: SCA0001 - Concurrence - Saturday, May 31, 2008
May 20, 2008: HB4203 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 20, 2008
April 9, 2008: HB4203 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 09, 2008
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor