+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On December 14, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that neither the Governor nor any agency or agency head under the jurisdiction of the Governor has any rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion.
+ − Statute Amended
- 30 ILCS 605/7 - from Ch. 127, par. 133b10