+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
- Postponed - Judiciary Criminal Law
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary Criminal Law
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Franco Coladipietro
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 009-002-000
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 5, 2006 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 19, 2007: HB0042 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 19, 2007
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor