+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Executive Committee
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 10 ILCS 5/2A-1.2 - from Ch. 46, par. 2A-1.2
- 10 ILCS 5/2A-48 - from Ch. 46, par. 2A-48
- 105 ILCS 5/34-3 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-3
- 105 ILCS 5/34-4 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-4
- 105 ILCS 5/34-4.1 new -
- 105 ILCS 5/34-4.2 new -
- 105 ILCS 5/34-13.1 -
- 105 ILCS 5/34-21.9 new -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor