+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee
On April 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Edward D. Maloney
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-001
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-001
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to State Government Administration Committee
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gary Hannig
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 30 ILCS 500/1-15.120 new -
- 30 ILCS 500/45-10 -
- 30 ILCS 500/50-17 new -
- 35 ILCS 5/1501 - from Ch. 120, par. 15-1501
+ − Vote
February 25, 2004: HB4194 - Third Reading - Wednesday, February 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor