+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- To Government Consolidation Analysis Subcommittee
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 15, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor