+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 28, 2018 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 014-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis
On May 21, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 14, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis