+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016
On January 3, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Vote
April 14, 2015: HB4178 - Executive - Apr 14, 2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor