+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 29, 2008 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0765
- Effective Date January 1, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 30, 2008 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2008 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000
On May 30, 2008 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On May 28, 2008 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Raymond Poe
On May 27, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2008
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2008
- Do Pass as Amended Housing and Community Affairs; 008-000-000
On May 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Housing and Community Affairs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On May 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
On April 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Housing and Community Affairs
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 8, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 012-000-000
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
On November 15, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On November 13, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that this Section does not apply to any entity that merely provides the host platform on the web site to the Internet gaming service provider. Makes a technical change.