+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On August 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2004
- Second Reading
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Sen. Kathleen L. Wojcik
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2004
- Do Pass Labor & Commerce; 007-001-000
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2004
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Monique D. Davis
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 105/4.02 - from Ch. 23, par. 6104.02
+ − Vote
March 25, 2004: HB4176 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (106)
Type:
Primary Sponsor