+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 27, 2022 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0924
- Effective Date May 27, 2022
- Governor Approved
On May 6, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-000
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2022
- Second Reading
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass Executive; 011-004-000
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 8, 2022
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 4, 2022
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz
- Postponed - Executive
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 24, 2022
- Arrive in Senate
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-043-000
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 005-003-000
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
On October 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On October 15, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 105 ILCS 5/5-2 - from Ch. 122, par. 5-2
- 105 ILCS 5/5-3 - from Ch. 122, par. 5-3
- 105 ILCS 5/5-4 - from Ch. 122, par. 5-4