+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (71)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-1090
- Effective Date June 1, 2007
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Recedes 056-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Recedes 056-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Recede Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 008-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Recede Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 008-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Recede Rules Referred to Local Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Rules Referred to Local Government
- Placed on Calendar Order of Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 01,02-November 15, 2006
- Secretary's Desk - Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 01,02
- Approved for Consideration Rules
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Non-Concurs by Voice Vote
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Non-Concurs by Voice Vote
- Secretary's Desk - Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 01,02
- Placed on Calendar Order of Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 01,02
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Recede Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Recede Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. John A. Fritchey
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. John A. Fritchey
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. John A. Fritchey
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. John A. Fritchey
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1,2
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2006
- Second Reading
- Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 27, 2006
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cheryl Axley
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Local Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Local Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
- Assigned to Local Government
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 23, 2006
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John A. Fritchey
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Reform Committee; 006-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elections & Campaign Reform Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elections & Campaign Reform Committee
- Assigned to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John A. Fritchey
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the bill as introduced with the following changes: Requires the candidate to submit an affidavit as to his or her name changes and the dates of those changes. Makes failure to comply grounds for denying certification of the candidate's name for the ballot or removal from the ballot, as appropriate.
House Floor Amendment No. 2
Further amends the Election Code. In the prohibition against the use of titles in nomination papers, petitions, and certificates and on ballots, removes the exemption for "Mrs." in the case of a married woman.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 (Senate recedes Nov 29, 2006)
Further amends the Election Code. Requires that an election authority transmit a person's name, address, and precinct, ward, township, and district numbers to the State Board of Elections within one business day after the person's grace period registration, grace period voting, or early voting for posting of that information on the State Board of Elections' website accessible by State and local political committees.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 (Senate recedes Nov 29, 2006)
Further amends the Election Code. Requires that an election authority transmit a person's name, address, and precinct, ward, township, and district numbers to the State Board of Elections within one business day after the person's grace period registration, grace period voting, or early voting for posting of that information on the State Board of Elections' website accessible by State and local political committees.
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 10 ILCS 5/7-10.2 - from Ch. 46, par. 7-10.2
- 10 ILCS 5/7-17 - from Ch. 46, par. 7-17
- 10 ILCS 5/8-8.1 - from Ch. 46, par. 8-8.1
- 10 ILCS 5/10-5.1 - from Ch. 46, par. 10-5.1
- 10 ILCS 5/16-3 - from Ch. 46, par. 16-3