+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 25, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything and reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following change: requires that the service provider take measures reasonably designed to provide service free of spam (now, requires that the service be provided reasonably free of spam).
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 23, 2004: HB4171 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 23, 2004
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor