+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis
- Motion Prevailed by Voice Vote
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Monique D. Davis
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Remains in Higher Education Committee
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Higher Education Committee; 003-004-000
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor