+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On November 7, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On November 2, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert S. Molaro