+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 8, 2022
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 4, 2022
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 104-000-000
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On October 19, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On October 5, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 5/3-2-4 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-2-4
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2022: HB4164
February 1, 2022: HB4164 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor