+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 27, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2023
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0922
On May 6, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 6, 2022
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Transportation; 017-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 5, 2022
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 104-000-000
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On October 19, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On October 4, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2022: HB4163 - Third Reading
April 4, 2022: HB4163 - Transportation
March 3, 2022: HB4163
February 1, 2022: HB4163 - Transportation: Regulation, Roads
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor