+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On May 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Held in Agriculture and Conservation
On May 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation
On April 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
On April 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 080-029-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Removed from Short Debate Status
On April 3, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Drivers Education & Safety Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Drivers Education & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Drivers Education & Safety Committee
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Drivers Education & Safety Committee
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On November 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that no person may transport any equidae in a vehicle or trailer containing 2 or more levels (instead of 2 or more levels of equidae). Provides penalties for the first offense and any subsequent offenses.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 8, 2008: HB4162 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 08, 2008
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor