+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On May 31, 2014 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary; 013-000-000
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2014
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 3, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor