+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Revenue Committee
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert F. Flider
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 35 ILCS 105/3-50 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.3-50
- 35 ILCS 120/2-45 - from Ch. 120, par. 441-45
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor