+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
- Referred to Assignments
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021
- Arrive in Senate
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
+ − Statute Amended
- 40 ILCS 5/9-158 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 9-158
+ − Votes (2)
April 21, 2021: HB0416 - Third Reading
March 12, 2021: HB0416 - Personnel & Pensions
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor