+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 27, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date May 27, 2022
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0921
On May 6, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 100-012-000
- House Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-001-000
On April 3, 2022 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 048-001-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Margaret Croke
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2022
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1) the following amendments will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Margaret Croke
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-010-001
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Margaret Croke
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-005-000
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On October 19, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On September 29, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 002
Extends the repeal date of specific Sections related to compliance in the Common Interest Community Association Act and the Condominium Property Act to January 1, 2024 (rather than July 1, 2022). Amends the Condominium and Common Interest Community Ombudsperson Act. Extends the repeal date of the Act to January 1, 2024 (rather than July 1, 2022). Adds an immediate effective date.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 765 ILCS 160/1-30
- 765 ILCS 605/19 - from Ch. 30, par. 319
- 765 ILCS 160/1-90
- 765 ILCS 605/35
- 765 ILCS 615/70