+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016
On January 3, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
On December 2, 2015 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
On November 10, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted 068-015-010
On November 9, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On November 2, 2015 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Burke
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes appropriations to the Illinois Community College Board, the Illinois Board of Higher Education, the Illinois Mathematics and Science Academy, the Illinois Student Assistance Commission, and State universities for specified purposes. Provides that the appropriation authority is valid only for costs incurred from July 1, 2015 through June 30, 2016. Effective immediately.
+ − Votes (2)
November 10, 2015: HFA0001 - Amendment - Tuesday, November 10, 2015
April 14, 2015: HB4156 - Executive - Apr 14, 2015
+ − Sponsors (67)
Type:
Primary Sponsor