+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Tabled By Sponsor Rep. William B. Black
- Motion Prevailed
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b) Rep. William B. Black
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- Remains in Gaming Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Gaming Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Gaming Committee
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Gaming Committee
On October 15, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On October 12, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William B. Black
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that there is no rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor