+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 16, 2015 in the House:
- Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto June 30, 2015
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Vetoed
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 033-025-000
- Motion Withdrawn Sen. John J. Cullerton
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 033-025-000
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. John J. Cullerton
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; 014-010-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John M. Cabello
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. John M. Cabello
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-051-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- Arrive in Senate
On May 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes FY16 appropriations to various entities for specified purposes. Effective July 1, 2015.