+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Kurt M. Granberg
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Telecommunications Committee
On October 3, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor